This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:13:24 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR VS DEMETRIA K. JONES

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 UNIFUND CCR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEMETRIA K JONES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4901

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DEMETRIA K. JONES

JONES, DEMETRIA K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS AS TO DEMETRIA K. JONES, BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: REQUEST TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED ON 06/26/12..

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Converted Disposition; 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: JONES DEMETRIA K.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment REQDNE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: REQUEST TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED ON 06/26/12..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CDBFCN: CASE DISPO`D - BANKRUPTCY/FEDERAL COURT NOTIFICATION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS AS TO DEMETRIA K. JONES, BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0317-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270317 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less