This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 16:28:51 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS MONICO B TANGAAN

Case Summary

On 01/02/2013 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONICO B TANGAAN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8792

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendants

MONICO B TANGAAN

TANGAAN, MONICO B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL, CHRISTOPHER A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC SERVED ON MONICO B TANGAAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/11/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION STATEMENT OF VENUE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: TANGAAN MONICO B; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: UNIFUND CCR LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC SERVED ON MONICO B TANGAAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/11/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION STATEMENT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130102-0270-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301020270 UNIFUND CCR LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial: UNIFUND CCR LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address). Matthew W. Quall, 183759 Manuel E. ignacio, 279191 Christopher A. Miguel 283127 Lang, Richert & Patch 5200 NORTH PALM AVE, Suite 401 FRESNO, CA 93704 TELEPHONE NO. (888) 564-6118 fomonay (559)-228-6727

E-MAIL ADDRESS - ~ FILED

ATTORNEY FOR (Name): Plaintiff, UNIFUND CCR, LLC SAN MATEO CAUNTY

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

STREET ADDRESS 400 COUNTY CENTER SECOND FLOOR

MAILING ADDRESS.

city aND ZIP CODE: Redwood City, CA 94063 BRANCHNAME Civil Division

FOR COURT USE ONLY

PLAINTIFF: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California DEFENDANT: MONICO B TANGAAN, an individual, and Does 1-100, inclusive

X] DOES 1 TO 100 CONTRACT

[X] COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number): ] CROSS-COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number, Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER

[X] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [X] does not exceed $10,000 [] exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 [ ] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) [ ] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [ ] from limited to unlimited ] from unlimited to limited

-—h

. Plaintiff* (name or names): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California

alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): MONICO B TANGAAN, an individual.

2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 4 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult [X] except plaintiff (name): UNIFUND CCR, LLC (1) [ ] acorporation qualified to do business in California (2) [X] an unincorporated entity (describe): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California. (3) [ ] other (specify): b. [ ] Plaintiff (name): a. [ ] has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [ ] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify): c. [ ] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c.

4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person [ ] except defendant (name): [ ] exceptdefendant (name): (1) [ ] abusiness organization, form unknown (1) [ ] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [ ] a corporation (2) [ ] acorporation (3) [ ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [ ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [ ] apublic entity (describe): (4) [ ] apublic entity (describe) (5) [ ] other (specify): (5) [ ] Other (specify):

Page 1 of 4

PLD-C-001

| [SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR. LLC v. MONICO B TANGAAN

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): _1-50 were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [X] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): _51-100 are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names).

5. [ ] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [ ] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [ ] is excused from complying because (specify):

6. [ ] This action is subjectto [ ] Civil Code section 1812.10 [ ] Civil Code section 2984.4. 7. This court is the proper court because . [ ] adefendant entered into the contract here. . [ 1 adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into. . [X] a defendant lives here now. [ ] the contract was to be performed here. [ ] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [ ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. . [ 1 other (specify):

Q@ o0 a0UTo

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of attached):

[X] Breach of Contract [X] Common Counts [ 1 Other (specify): 9. [ ] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [X] damages of: $ 1,399.85 b. [X] interest on the damages (1) [ ] according to proof (2) [X] at the rate of (specify). 10.00 percent per year from (date). 12/07/2010 c. [X] attorney's fees

([ Jof$ (2) [X] according to proof.

d. [ ] other (specify):

11. [ ] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

N~ Date: Novermber ?’bf , 2012 Matthew W. Quall, 183759 > Manuel E. Ignacio, 279191 Christopher A. Miguel 283127

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.) D SHORTTITE DNFONDCCRIICY WONCOBTARGRAN ] orsenwwes { [ 'SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. MONICO B TANGAAN CASE NUMBER: v First (number)

D SHORTTITE DNFONDCCRIICY WONCOBTARGRAN ] orsenwwes { [ 'SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. MONICO B TANGAAN CASE NUMBER: v First (number)

CAUSE OF ACTION - BREACH OF CONTRACT

ATTACHMENT TO [X] Complaint [ ] Cross - Complaint (Use a separate cause of action form for each cause of action.)

BC-1. Plaintiff (name): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California alleges that on or about (date): 01/13/2006 a [X]written [ ]Joral [ ] other (specify): agreement was made between (name parties to agreement): CITIBANK, NA, and MONICO B TANGAAN

[ ] A copy of the agreement is attached as Exhibit A, or [X] The essential terms of the agreement [ ] are stated in Attachment BC-1 [X] are as follows (specify):

MONICO B TANGAAN ("Defendant") opened an account with CITIBANK, NA, Account Number ending with 1332, whereby Defendant agreed that in consideration of the extension of credit by CITIBANK, NA, Defendant would make monthly payments to retire the debt incurred by Defendant on the account. In an action to collect on the account, the prevailing party would be entitled to attorney's fees and costs of suit. UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California was thereafter assigned all rights, title, and interest in the account between CITIBANK, NA and Defendant, and all of the rights afforded to CITIBANK, NA under said account.

BC-2. On or about (dates): within the last four (4) years defendant breached the agreement by: [ ] the acts specified in Attachment BC-2 [X] the following acts (specify):

Failing to make payment on Account Number ending with 1332consistent with the terms and conditions governing the account.

BC-3. Plaintiff has performed all obligations to defendant except those obligations plaintiff was prevented or excused from performing.

BC-4. Plaintiff suffered damages legally (proximately) caused by defendant's breach of the agreement. [ ] as stated in Attachment BC4 [X] as follows (specify):

Plaintiff has suffered damages as a resuit of Defendant's failure to pay the outstanding balance on the account consistent with the terms and conditions governing the account. There remains an outstanding balance on the account of $1,399.85. To date, interest accrued totals $267.29 (which is calculated at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from the date the debt was charged off by the original creditor).

BC-5. [X] Piaintiff is entitled to attorney fees by an agreement or a statute [ Jof $ [X] according to proof.

BC-6. [ ] Other:

PLD-C-001 {Rev. January 1, 2007 Complaint- Contract Page 3 of 4

PLD-C-001 {Rev. January 1, 2007 Complaint- Contract Page 3 of 4 ." — ' SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. MONICO B TANGAAN CASE NUMBER: ?

." — ' SHORT TITLE: UNIFUND CCR, LLC v. MONICO B TANGAAN CASE NUMBER: ?

Second (number)

CAUSE OF ACTION - COMMON COUNTS

ATTACHMENT TO [X] Complaint [ ] Cross - Complaint (Use a separate cause of action form for each cause of action.)

CC-1. Plaintiff (name): UNIFUND CCR, LLC, a LLC doing business in California alleges that defendant (name): MONICO B TANGAAN became indebted to [ ] plaintiff [X] other (name): Plaintiff's predecessor in interest, CITIBANK, NA

a. [X] within the last four years (1) [X] onan open book account for money due. (2) [ ]because an account was stated in writing by and between plaintiff and defendant in which it was agreed that defendant was indebted to plaintiff.

b. [X]withinthe last [ ]two years [X] four years (1) [ ]for money had and received by defendant for the use and benefit of plaintiff. (2) [ ]for work, labor, services and materials rendered at the special instance and request of defendant and for which defendant promises to pay plaintiff [ ] the sumof $ [ ] the reasonable value. (3) [ ]for goods, wares, and merchandise sold and delivered to defendant and for which defendant promised to pay plaintiff [ 1the sumof $ [ ] the reasonable value. (4) [X] for money lent by plaintiff to defendant at defendant’s request. (5) [X] for money paid, laid out, and expended to or for defendant at defendant's special instance and request. (6) [ ] other (specify):

CC-2. $ 1399.85, which is the reasonable value, is due and unpaid despite plaintiffs demand, plus prejudgment interest [ ] according to proof [X] at the rate of 10.00 percent per year from (date): 12/07/2010

CC-3. [X] Plaintiff is entitled to attorney fees by an agreement or a statute [] of$ [X] according to proof.

CC-4. [ ]Other:

PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007 Complaint- Contract Page 4 of 4