This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 17:27:40 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC VS MARIA D AYONG

Case Summary

On 01/10/2013 UNIFUND CCR LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA D AYONG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bergeron, Joseph E, Buchwald, Gerald J, Buchwald, Gerald J., Franchi, Don R. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9048

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bergeron, Joseph E

Buchwald, Gerald J

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Franchi, Don R.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND CCR LLC

UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MARIA D AYONG

DELACRUZ, MARIA D

AYONG, MARIA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIELE, KENNETH J

8581 Santa Monica Blvd #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Schiaman, Steve

Defendant Attorney

GRAHAM, KENNETH R

 

Court Documents

Order.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SIGNED BY JUDGE J. BERGERON ON 08/21/13 Comment O2: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, SIGNED BY JUDGE J. BERGERON ON 08/21/13 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTY.'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTY.'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SERVED ON SEE LIST WITH A SERVICE DA Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SERVED ON SEE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 05/15/13 FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC FILED BY MARIA D AYONG REPRESENTED BY KENNETH R GRAHAM Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC FILED BY MARIA D AYONG, REPRESENTED BY KENNETH R GRAHAM

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC SERVED ON MARIA D AYONG WIT Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF UNIFUND CCR LLC SERVED ON MARIA D AYONG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/27/13.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Cos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $25.00 Credit: $146.32 Interest: $98.68

Notice of Court Trial.

Notice of Court Trial

Conversion Action.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S) Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY UNIFUND CCR LLC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S)

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECL. & POR. SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST BY MA Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; DECL. & POR. SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST BY MAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 06/20/13.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Motion.

NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY MARIA D AYONG

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SERVED ON KENNETH J. MIELE WITH A SERVICE DATE OF Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SERVED ON KENNETH J. MIELE WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/06/13 FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00. Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10,000.00.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Franchi Don R.; Judgment Type; Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Awarded Against: AYONG, MARIA D; Amount; Damages: $19,702.26; Costs: $430.00; Total: $20132.26; Comment: ON January 09, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M. IN dEPARTMENT 15, COURTROOM 7C OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT LOCATED AT 400 COUNTY CENTER, REDWOOD CITY, CALIFORNIA 94063, THIS COURT CONDUCTED A COURT TRIAL. DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THIS COURT GRANTS JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF UNIFIED CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MARIA D. AYONG AKA MARIA D.. DELACRUZ AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL $19,702.26; INTEREST 0; ATTORNEY FEES -0 ; COSTS $430.00 FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $20,132.26/ STEVEN SCHAIMAN, ATTORNEY APPEARED FOR PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Writ Issued. Additional Info: Comment Writ Issued SAN FRANCISCO Issued On: 02/09/18 Amount: $20134.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Cos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $25.00 Credit: $146.32 Interest: $98.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Writ Issued. Additional Info: Comment Writ Issued SAN MATEO Issued On: 02/09/18 Amount: $20134.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Cos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $25.00 Credit: $146.32 Interest: $98.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment Amount: $20132.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Judgment JUDGMENT FOLLOWING COURT TRIAL Comment JUDGMENT FOLLOWING COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs. Additional Info: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Comment (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Prove-Up Hearing. Additional Info: *CIV Minute Order - Default Prove-Up Hearing 01/09/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present Plaintiff: UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANYAttorney: Schiaman, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2013
  • Financial: AYONG, MARIA D; Total Financial Assessment $550.00; Total Payments and Credits $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-010069-HOJ MIELE, KENNETH J $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-010066-HOJ MIELE, KENNETH J $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-005053-HOJ PMGI, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 201301100280 UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Financial info for UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • Financial: UNIFUND CCR LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $445.00; Total Payments and Credits $445.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Kenneth J. Miele, Bar #165730

Law Offices of Kenosian & Miele,D

8581 Santa Monica Bivd., #17 ' NTY Los Angeles, CA 90069 SAN MATEO COU Phone (888) 566-7644 JAN 10 2013 Fax (310) 289-5177 ax (310) Glerk of the Superior Count Attorney for UNIFUND CCR, LLC By SEPUTY CLERK

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN MATEO REDWOOD CITY LIMITED CIVIL

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, Case No.: ’

A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY8

Plaintiff,

COMPLAINT

VS. (Breach of Contract and Common Counts) MARIA D. AYONG aka Demand EXCEEDS $10,000.00

MARIA D. DELACRUZ

and DOES 1 to 5, inclusive,

Defendant(s)

PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC

alleges causes of action against DEFENDANT(s) and Does 1 to 5 inclusive: 1. Plaintiff is A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . 2. Each named defendant is a natural person. 3. The true names and capacities of defendants sued as

DOES 1 to 5 are unknown to plaintiff. Each fictitiously named defendant is some way

Complaint

PRAYER

WHEREFORE, as to all causes of action, plaintiff prays for judgment as follows: a. Damages of $19702.26; b. Interest from and after 07-28-10 according to proof; c. Attorney's fees according to proof; d. Costs of suit; and

e. For such other relief as is fair, just and equitable.

Dated: December 3, 2012.

Law Offices of Kenosian & Miele, LLP

By: Kennatth J. Miele Attorney for Plaintiff

Complaint

VERIFICATION

(C.C.P. §§446, 431.30 (d))

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

| am the Attorney for the plaintiff UNIFUND CCR, LLC a party to this action. Such party is absent from the County of Los Angeles where attorneys have their offices, and | make this verification for and on behalf of that party for that reason. | am informed and believe and on that ground allege that the matters stated in the foregoing document are true. | declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing is true and

correct. .

Executed under the laws of the State of California at Los Angeles, CA on December 3, 2012.

Signature: Kennetth J. Miele , Attorney for PLAINTIFF > Complaint