This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 12:30:23 (UTC).

Uluakimata Naufahu vs. SAFEWAY INC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Uluakimata Naufahu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAFEWAY INC,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Mau, Michael L, Halperin, Ernst A and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1660

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Mau, Michael L

Halperin, Ernst A

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Naufahu, Uluakimata

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

Albertsons Companies, Inc. DBA Safeway

SAFEWAY INC.

SAFEWAY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

Defendant Attorney

FOWLER, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

46684CaseMana005cbc5

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 2/16/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/06/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 9/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 9/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 12/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 12/6/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/07/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 05/25/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Naufahu, UluakimataDefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 5/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 5/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/06/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference on 4/6/2022 at 9:00 AM Comment Case Management Conference on 4/6/2022 at 9:00 AM

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/16/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names; Naufahu, Uluakimata; SAFEWAY INC; Albertsons Companies, Inc. DBA Safeway; DOES 1 TO 20; SAFEWAY INC.; Comment: see minute order dated 07/07/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Philip Tukia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/07/2022 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Phillip Tukia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 05/25/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: Naufahu, UluakimataDefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 5/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 5/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Phillip Tukia specially for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/06/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: FOWLER, EMILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CMC 10/29/20 Comment CMC 10/29/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Naufahu, Uluakimata; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-016742-HOJ Naufahu, Uluakimata $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Naufahu, Uluakimata; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Naufahu, Uluakimata; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less