This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 23:07:46 (UTC).

TIRZAH FIORITO vs. THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 TIRZAH FIORITO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Buchwald, Gerald J., DuBois, Richard H., DUBOIS and ETEZADI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0918

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Buchwald, Gerald J.

DuBois, Richard H.

Not Yet Classifieds

DUBOIS

ETEZADI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIORITO, TIRZAH

Defendants

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

RITZ-CARLTON HALF MOON BAY

CORDAY, TAMI

THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENNELLY, DENNIS L

Sullivan, Mark Francis

Defendant Attorneys

NORTON, CONSTANCE E.

Kinoshita, Cheryl A

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ETC Comment DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, ETC

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT Comment REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC

Declaration.

Declaration OF MARK F. SULLIVAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVER Comment OF MARK F. SULLIVAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO IMPOSE MONETARY ETC

Statement.

Statement OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ETC Comment OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, ETC

Declaration.

Declaration OF KEN BAUER Comment OF KEN BAUER

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC Comment TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

Order.

Order Type: STIPULATION TO SHORTEN NOTICE PERIOD FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNAT Comment Type: STIPULATION TO SHORTEN NOTICE PERIOD FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 09/11/17

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS./COMPLAINT, ETC. SERVED TO LYANNE GARES, AGENT Comment SUMMONS./COMPLAINT, ETC. SERVED TO LYANNE GARES, AGENT

Declaration in Reply.

Declaration in Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS OF $5032.50 AGAINST DEFENDANT.... Comment IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS OF $5032.50 AGAINST DEFENDANT....

Motion for Summary Judgment.

*CIV Minute Order - Motion for Summary Judgment 12/08/2017 Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KENNELLY, DENNIS LAttorney: Sullivan, Mark FrancisDefendantAttorney: NORTON, CONSTANCE E.Attorney: Kinoshita, Cheryl ADefendantAttorney: NORTON, CONSTANCE E.Attorney: Kinoshita, Cheryl ADefendantAttorney: NORTON, CONSTANCE E.Attorney: Kinoshita, Cheryl A

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION F Comment OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ETC

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of DEFENDANT RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY LLC, MARRIOTT INTERN Comment DEFENDANT RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, LLC, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC', AND TAMI CORDAY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC Comment IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

Objections to Evidence.

Objections to Evidence SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC Comment SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS $5032.50, ETC Comment ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS $5,032.50, ETC

Declaration.

Declaration OF MARK F. SULLIVAN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC Comment OF MARK F. SULLIVAN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC

Complaint.

Complaint

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketCase dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal 01/09/2018 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketJury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL AS TO TAMI CORDAY ONLY); Party; Name: CORDAY TAMI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties). Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice AS TO TAMI CORDAY ONLY Comment With Prejudice AS TO TAMI CORDAY ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Sanction. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Sanction 12/15/2017 Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Foiles Robert D; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: CORDAY, TAMI; Comment: Dismissal with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/12/2017 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ANDRE DOE PERSON IN CHARGE OF OFFICE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ANDRE DOE, PERSON IN CHARGE OF OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIORITO, TIRZAH : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-036036-HOJ HOWARD JOHNSON $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIORITO, TIRZAH : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: FIORITO, TIRZAH; Total Financial Assessment $695.00; Total Payments and Credits $695.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less