This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/04/2022 at 07:51:39 (UTC).

TINA CHESTER AND ERIC CHESTER

Case Summary

On 01/16/2015 TINA CHESTER AND ERIC CHESTER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANCHI, Franchi, Don R, DON R. FRANCHI and DON FRANCHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7824

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FRANCHI

Franchi, Don R

DON R. FRANCHI

DON FRANCHI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHESTER, TINA

Respondent

CHESTER, ERIC

 

Court Documents

Family Law Status Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment Dept: 15 FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: STUBBS, BRIAN PRespondentAttorney: LORVAN, SIDNEY

Settlement Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment Voluntery Settlement Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINAAttorney: STUBBS, BRIAN PRespondent: CHESTER, ERICAttorney: LORVAN, SIDNEY

Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINAAttorney: STUBBS, BRIAN PRespondent: CHESTER, ERICAttorney: LORVAN, SIDNEY

Request for Order RE: Modification.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINAAttorney: STUBBS, BRIAN PRespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment to trail the hearing set on 3/10/17 @ 9:00 a.m. Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINAAttorney: STUBBS, BRIAN PRespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Respondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/20/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINARespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/21/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINARespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/07/2017 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present Respondent: CHESTER, ERIC

Request for Order.

*FAM Minute Order - Request for Order 02/09/2018 Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT, CHILD SUPPORT & OTHER: BIRTH CERTIFICATE OF RENEE, REIMBURSEMENT OF DISPUTED EXPENSES, TRANSFER ENTITLEMENT TO CLAIM DAUGHTER AS DEPENDENT TO FATHER Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINARespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHESTER, ERIC; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-011144-HOJ CHESTER, ERIC $23.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHESTER, ERIC; Transaction Assessment $23.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Comment BY ERIC CHESTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SUPPORT ALLOCATION RE: MARCH 10 2017 OAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BIRTH CERTIFICATE FOR RENEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketDocument.; Additional Info: Comment dissomaster report pritned by the court on 2/9/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment SPOUSAL OR PARTNER SUPPORT, CHILD SUPPORT & OTHER: BIRTH CERTIFICATE OF RENEE, REIMBURSEMENT OF DISPUTED EXPENSES, TRANSFER ENTITLEMENT TO CLAIM DAUGHTER AS DEPENDENT TO FATHER Parties Present Petitioner: CHESTER, TINARespondent: CHESTER, ERIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
431 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re:.; Additional Info: Comment OSCF: (FL) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY FILED BY TINA CHESTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY TINA CHESTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150116-0414-CK 210/ 30.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketCourt reporter fees.; Additional Info: Comment CRFEE1: COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30.00 PAID BY TINA CHESTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment NOT: NOTICE OF TRIAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150116-0412-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less