This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:22:02 (UTC).

TIN MAUNG WAI AND DOROTHY WIN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 TIN MAUNG WAI AND DOROTHY WIN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8179

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WAI, TIN MAUNG

Respondent

WIN, DOROTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: WIN DOROTHY; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: WAI, TIN MAUNG; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 04/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JMT: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEJM: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: Comment RDDEF: (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF WAI AS TO DOROTHY WIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment DRSDD: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY TIN MAUNG WAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF WAI AS TO DOROTHY WIN FILED. SIGNED BY: DOROTHY WIN. DATE SIGNED: 06/28/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Proof of Service. Additional Info: Comment POS: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PET/SUMMONS/BLANK RESPONSE SERVED ON DOROTHY WIN BY MAIL (NTC & ACK) WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 06/27/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY TIN MAUNG WAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0504-CK 184/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for WAI, TIN MAUNG : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260504 WAI, TIN MAUNG $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for WAI, TIN MAUNG : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: WAI, TIN MAUNG; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less