This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:31 (UTC).

TIMOTHY W.SCHUMACHER vs AMIEE B ARMSBY,et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 TIMOTHY W SCHUMACHER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AMIEE B ARMSBY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bergeron, Joseph E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6400

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bergeron, Joseph E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STREETSSUEYOSHI, NORIKOS

SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER

Defendants

ARMSBY, MICHAEL W

ARMSBY, AIMEE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARULICH, PAUL J.

 

Court Documents

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS FILED BY AIMEE B ARMSBY MICHAEL W ARMSBY.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER FILED BY AIMEE B ARMSBY MICHAEL W ARMSBY.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (3) Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TIMOTHY WALTER SCHUMACHER.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment POS1: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING DEMURRER AND SUPPORTING DOCS SERVED ON TIMOTHY WALTER SCHUMACHER BY MAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 09/17/12.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Order.

ORDER (2) Comment O: ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER SIGNED BY JOSEPH E BERGERON ON 10/22/12, FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

DEMURRER Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHUMACHER FILED BY AIMEE B ARMSBY MICHAEL W ARMSBY REPRESENTED BY PAUL J. BARULICH

Response.

RESPONSE Comment RESP: MICHAEL W ARMSBY AIMEE B ARMSBY`S RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

Order.

ORDER Comment O: ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING TO 10/22/12 SIGNED BY JUDGE BERGERON ON 09/26/12, FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY AIMEE B ARMSBY MICHAEL W ARMSBY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER (2) Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: ARMSBY MICHAEL W; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: ARMSBY, AIMEE B; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: STREETSSUEYOSHI, NORIKOS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); Party; Name: SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: NOTICE (3) Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TIMOTHY WALTER SCHUMACHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER (2) Comment O: ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER SIGNED BY JOSEPH E BERGERON ON 10/22/12, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY REBECCA HUERTA ON 10/22/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment SPFO: MR. WILKINS SHALL PREPARE A FORMAL ORDER CONSISTENT WITH THE ORDERS HEREIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: PLAINTIFF HAS UNTIL OCTOBER 29 2012 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE COURT CONFIRMS THE ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON OCTOBER 2 2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): PAUL A. WILKINS APPEARED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS AIMEE & MICHAEL ARMSBY.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 2446 LAKE BLVD REDWOOD CITY CA94062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for ARMSBY, MICHAEL W : Case Payment Receipt # 201209260041 ARMSBY, MICHAEL W $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for ARMSBY, MICHAEL W : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial: ARMSBY, MICHAEL W; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Financial info for ARMSBY, AIMEE B : Case Payment Receipt # 201210160043 ARMSBY, AIMEE B $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Financial info for ARMSBY, AIMEE B : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Financial: ARMSBY, AIMEE B; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial info for SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER : Case Payment Receipt # 201208210018 SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER $385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial info for SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER : Transaction Assessment $385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial: SCHUMACHER, TIMOTHY WALTER; Total Financial Assessment $385.00; Total Payments and Credits $385.00

    Read MoreRead Less