This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 22:51:19 (UTC).

THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC VS RUBEN NOBOA

Case Summary

On 06/29/2012 THOMPSON, MAHAN ASSOC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUBEN NOBOA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5022

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC

Defendant

NOBOA, RUBEN

Assignee

AMA COLLECTION SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLLARD, RALPH L

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $38.37, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest COS Comment and declaration of accrued interest COSTS: 430.00 CREDIT: 728.18 INTEREST: 242.16

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 343 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 343.52, COST 240.00.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: CERTIFICATE OF ADDED COSTS FILED BY ATTORNEY DUANE S OLIVEIRA ESQ, FILED.

Request.

REQUEST Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES WITHOUT PREJUDICE..

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (2) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY AMA COLLECTION SERVICES. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $61.18, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00 ---

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEOStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 8/24/16Amount: $1 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 8/24/16 Amount: $1785.52

Bankruptcy Document Received From US Bankruptcy Court.

Bankruptcy Document Received From US Bankruptcy Court NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE Comment NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCOS Comment and declaration of accrued interest COSTS: 430.00 CREDIT: 728.18 INTEREST: 242.16

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 343 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 343.52, COST 240.00.

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Document.

CERTIFICATE OF ADDED COSTS FILED BY ATTORNEY DUANE S OLIVEIRA ESQ, FILED. Comment FILED: CERTIFICATE OF ADDED COSTS FILED BY ATTORNEY DUANE S OLIVEIRA, ESQ, FILED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY AMA COLLECTION SERVICES. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $61.18, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00 ---

Assignment of Judgment.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO AMA COLLECTION SERVICES FILED Comment AJ: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO AMA COLLECTION SERVICES FILED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $38.37, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Return.; Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: SAN MATEOStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 8/24/16Amount: $1 Comment County: SAN MATEO Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 8/24/16 Amount: $1785.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBankruptcy Document Received From US Bankruptcy Court.; Additional Info: Bankruptcy Document Received From US Bankruptcy Court NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE Comment NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCOS Comment and declaration of accrued interest COSTS: 430.00 CREDIT: 728.18 INTEREST: 242.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMA COLLECTION SERVICES; Mail Payment Receipt # 2016-038866-HOJ RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMA COLLECTION SERVICES; Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; AMA COLLECTION SERVICES; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketWrit Issued.; Additional Info: Comment SAN MATEO;1785.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 343 Comment and declaration of accrued interest 343.52, COST 240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 141007-0665-CK 141/ 25.00 044/ 1.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC; Case Payment Receipt # 201206290316 THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; THOMPSON, MAHAN & ASSOC INC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION FOR MONEY DAMAGES FALLS WITHIN THE MONETARY JRISDI CTION OF THE SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILE Comment DECL: DECLARATION FOR MONEY DAMAGES FALLS WITHIN THE MONETARY JRISDI CTION OF THE SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY THOMPSON MAHAN & ASSOC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0316-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001 FOR COURT USE ONLY

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State ... number, and address):

RALPH L POLLARD (BAR# 95975) LAW OFFICE OF RALPH L POLLARD 145 E 14TH ST #201 '

SAN LEANDRO, CA 94577-0579

TeLerHoNENO: (510) 638-4376 FAX NO. (Optional): (510) 638-8652 E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional) ' ATTORNEY FOR (Name) Thompson, Mahan & Assoc Inc. SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO streeTabpress. Limited Civil Jurisdiction maiLING ADDRess: 400 County Center cryanpzpcooe: Redwood City, CA 94063 BrancH NaMe. SAN MATEO JUDICIAL DISTRICT PLAINTIFF: Thompson, Mahan & Assoc Inc. dba AMA COLLECTION

SERVICES

DEFENDANT: RUBEN NOBOA,

CONTRACT

|_X_| COMPLAINT [__| AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

| ] CROSS-COMPLAINT [___| AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

E@ ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 [ ] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 [: ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) | ] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint | ] from limited to unlimited

[ | from unlimited to limited 1. Plaintiff* (name or names): Thompson, Mahan & Assoc Inc dha AMA COLLECTION SERVICES

AMA COLLECTION SERVICES

b. [___| has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):

c. [__| Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c. 4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person

except defendant (name). [___] except defendant (name):

(1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) [_| a business organization, form unknown

(2) [_] a corporation (2) [__] a corporation

(3) [___] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [_ ] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe):

(5) L__| other (specify): (5) || other (specify):

* If this form is used as a cross-complaint, plaintiff means cross-complainant and defendant means cross-defendant Page 1 of 2 . Code of Civil P . .

* If this form is used as a cross-complaint, plaintiff means cross-complainant and defendant means cross-defendant Page 1 of 2 . Code of Civil P . . SHORTTITLE: Thompson, Mahan & Assoc Inc. vs RUBEN NOBOA, CASE NUMBER:

SHORTTITLE: Thompson, Mahan & Assoc Inc. vs RUBEN NOBOA, CASE NUMBER:

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [ ] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. || Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. || Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. | Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [___| has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [ __] is excused from complying because (specify):

6.]___| This action is subjectto [___| Civil Code section 1812.10 [__| Civil Code section 2984.4. 7 his court is the proper court because

a defendant entered into the contract here.

. [__] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

. a defendant lives here now.

. [__] the contract was to be performed here.

. __] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. |1 real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

. 11 other (specify):

Q@ â„¢m0 a0 oo

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

[ ] Breach of Contract [ X_| Common Counts | Other (specify):

9. X | Other allegations: Plaintiff is assignee of the claim (s) for medical/dental services on which this action is based and is now the holder of the claim (s).

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. damages of: $ 591.00 b. |_X | interest on the damages (1) |__] according to proof (2) at the rate of (specify): 10.00 percent per year from (date): 7/7/09 ASSIGNMENT DATE c. attorney's fees (1) of: $147.00 (2) [__] according to proof. d. [X_] other (specify): $181.00 cost of filing this complaint, costs of service of process to be determined and such other relief deemed fair and equitable.

11.|__| The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

Date: JUNE 7, 2012 RALPH L., POLLARD (BAR# 95975) } )

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMA COLLECTION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF RALPH L. POLLARD