This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 01:15:30 (UTC).

THE POLICE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST LOUIS DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF ALPHABET, INC. vs. LARRY PAGE, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 THE POLICE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST LOUIS DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF ALPHABET, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LARRY PAGE,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0122

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE POLICE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST LOUIS DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF ALPHABET, INC.

Defendants

ALPHABET INC.

MULALLY, ALAN R

TILGHMAN, SHIRLEY M

MATHER, ANN

SHRIRAM, K. RAM

DOERR, L. JOHN

GREENE, DIANE B

OTELLINI, PAUL S

PAGE, LARRY

LEVINSON, ARTHUR D

DOES 1-25

BRIN, SERGEY

SCHMIDT, ERIC E

HENNESSY, JOHN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBBINS, BRIAN J

Defendant Attorney

CROSSON, BENJAMIN M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE AND SUBMISSION ETC. Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE AND SUBMISSION, ETC.

Notice.

Notice of ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 8/12/16 AND SUBMISSION OF ORD TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL Comment of ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 8/12/16 AND SUBMISSION OF ORD TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

Complaint.

Complaint COMPLEX Comment COMPLEX

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE Comment NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

Notice.

Notice OF RELATED CASE Comment OF RELATED CASE

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ASS-ON CASE. ETC Comment OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ASS-ON CASE. ETC

Notice.

Notice OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDER Comment OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.

Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record GINA STASSI Comment GINA STASSI

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL ETC. Comment OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE ETC. Comment OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF APPEARANCE Comment OF APPEARANCE

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE, ETC.

Notice.

Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE ETC. Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE, ETC.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ETC. Comment NOTICE OF SUBMISSION, ETC.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDER Comment OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.; Additional Info: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record GINA STASSI Comment GINA STASSI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL ETC. Comment OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN COUNSEL, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE ETC. Comment OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF APPEARANCE Comment OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE ETC. Comment NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE ETC. Comment OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ETC. Comment NOTICE OF SUBMISSION, ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ASS-ON CASE. ETC Comment OF SUBMISSION OF REQUEST TO COORDINATE ASS-ON CASE. ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; THE POLICE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST LOUIS DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF ALPHABET, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/23/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint COMPLEX Comment COMPLEX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF RELATED CASE Comment OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Police Retirement System of St. Louis is a litigant

Latest cases where Alphabet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBBINS BRIAN JAMES