This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:35:34 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Tracy Joe Sams

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Tracy Joe Sams. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Southern Prelim, -, Runde, John, Novak, Lisa A. and Holt, Rachel E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********75-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Southern Prelim, -

Runde, John

Novak, Lisa A.

Holt, Rachel E.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sams, Tracy Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Eberle, Adriana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Runde John; 001; HS11378-FEL-Possession For Sale Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 002; HS11379(a)-FEL-Sale/Offer To Sell/Transportation Of A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 003; VC23152(f)-MISD-Driving Under The Influence Of A Drug (eff. 01/01/2017); Not Guilty; 004; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 005; HS11375(b)(2)-MISD-Possession Of A Designated Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 006; HS11364-MISD-Possession Of Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Southern Prelim - Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment 1 HR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Defendant remains on bail..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Offer recited on the record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Preliminary hearing date is confirmed..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Time waiver for preliminary hearing.. Additional Info: Comment Defendant personally waived time for 10 court days and 60 calendar days for the preliminary hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Judge Offer.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Bail set at. Additional Info: Comment $40000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant waives the right to a hearing for probable cause. Additional Info: Comment for the arrest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Time not waived by defendant/counsel..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Probable Cause Declaration received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Sams, Tracy Joe

    Read MoreRead Less