This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:31:40 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Taylor Finn

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Taylor Finn. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Southern Call Jury Trial, -, Brown, Gilbert and Southern Pretrial, -. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Southern Call Jury Trial, -

Brown, Gilbert

Southern Pretrial, -

 

Party Details

Defendant

Finn, Taylor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Brown Gilbert; 001; VC23152(a)-MISD-Driving Under The Influence Of An Alcoholic Beverage; Not Guilty; 002; VC23152(b)-MISD-Driving While Under The Influence Of Alcohol .08 Percent; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Southern Call Jury Trial - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Southern Pretrial - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Time waived for trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defense attorney appeared for attorney of record.. Additional Info: Comment Attorney Present: FEIGER On behalf of attorney: DUNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Brown Gilbert Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice to Appear sent to defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less