This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:33:55 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Saman Daftarian

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Saman Daftarian. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Mallach, Barbara J., Runde, John and DuBois, Richard H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Mallach, Barbara J.

Runde, John

DuBois, Richard H.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Daftarian, Saman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sheldon, Marjorie

Cohen, David J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • To Set. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment To set ID hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Attorney appeared on behalf of defendant. Additional Info: Comment Cherie Wallace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • To Set. Additional Info: Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment To set Identification Hearing Parties Present Defendant: Daftarian, Saman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Identification Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mallach Barbara J. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Daftarian, SamanAttorney: Sheldon, Marjorie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Bail bond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Bail set at. Additional Info: Comment $10000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Sheriff's Office Representative Present:. Additional Info: Comment S. Minsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment - Felony Fugitive. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Daftarian, SamanAttorney: Cohen, David J

    Read MoreRead Less