Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:36:15 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Mario E Lopez

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Mario E Lopez. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Northern Call Jury Trial, - and Northern Pretrial, -. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********80-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Northern Call Jury Trial, -

Northern Pretrial, -

 

Party Details

Defendant

Lopez, Mario E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Fineman Nancy L.; 001; BP25662(a)-MISD-Possession Of Alcoholic Beverage By Minor; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Call Jury Trial - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Pretrial - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • CLETS Recall Printout.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Warrant Recalled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Court orders warrant recalled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Time waived for trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Warrant-Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Lopez, Mario E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Bench Warrant Ordered. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Comment $7,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Failure To Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less