This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:31:11 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Joseph Matthew Lynch

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Joseph Matthew Lynch. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********79-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L.

 

Party Details

Defendant

Lynch, Joseph Matthew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Bench Warrant Ordered. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Comment $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Failure To Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less