This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:29:43 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Joan Marie Catherine Nosenzo

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Joan Marie Catherine Nosenzo. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garratt, Stephanie. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garratt, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Defendant

Nosenzo, Joan Marie Catherine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Spano, Paula

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Probation Sentence; 002; PC25850(c)(6)-MISD-Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place Person,Vehicle; Probation Sentence; Probation; Type: Court - Summary Probation; Start Date: 07/03/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 07/03/2020; Status; Active; 07/03/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 09/08/2018; Start Time: 10:00 AM; Term Type: Jail Time; Term: 14 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Conduct Credit: 2 Days; Fee Totals; $235.00; Fee Totals; $235.00; 005; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Probation Sentence; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition; Judicial Officer; Garratt Stephanie; 001; HS11370.1(a)-FEL-Possession Of A Controlled Substance With Firearm; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 002; PC25850(c)(6)-MISD-Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place, Person,Vehicle; Pled Nolo Contendere; 003; VC10851(a)-MISD-Unlawful Driving Or Taking Of A Vehicle; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 004; PC496D(a)-MISD-Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 005; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Pled Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Garratt Stephanie; 005; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; No Contest / Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Garratt Stephanie; 002; PC25850(c)(6)-MISD-Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place, Person,Vehicle; No Contest / Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Garratt Stephanie; 001; HS11370.1(a)-FEL-Possession Of A Controlled Substance With Firearm; Not Guilty; 002; PC25850(c)(6)-FEL-Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place, Person,Vehicle; Not Guilty; 003; VC10851(a)-MISD-Unlawful Driving Or Taking Of A Vehicle; Not Guilty; 004; PC496D(a)-MISD-Receiving Stolen Property, Motor Vehicle; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Garratt Stephanie Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Waiver of Rights/Change of Plea filed..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • No legal cause.. Additional Info: Comment Defendant stated there is no legal cause why sentence should not now be pronounced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Arraignment for sentencing waived..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Time waived for sentencing..

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant remains on O.R..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Time not waived by defendant/counsel..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant handed preliminary hearing transcript..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment waived on Information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment on Information. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Garratt Stephanie Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Nosenzo, Joan Marie Catherine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing Transcript filed. Additional Info: Comment PH Transcripts placed in file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Information Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less