Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:32:11 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jacob Burton

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jacob Burton. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Northern Call Jury Trial, -, Runde, John, Northern Pretrial, - and Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Northern Call Jury Trial, -

Runde, John

Northern Pretrial, -

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Defendant

Burton, Jacob

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • Disposition: Probation Sentence; 001; PC594(b)(1)-MISD-Vandalism $400 Or More; Probation Sentence; Probation; Type: Court - Summary Probation; Start Date: 07/05/2018; Term: 18 Months; End Date: 01/05/2020; Status; Active; 07/05/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 07/05/2018; Start Time: 10:00 AM; Consecutive: ANY OTHER SENTENCE; Term Type: Jail Time; Term: 25 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 13 Days; Conduct Credit: 12 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: Good Time Work Time; Fee Totals; $235.00; Fee Totals; $235.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition; Judicial Officer; Mazzei Cristina; 001; PC594(b)(1)-MISD-Vandalism $400 Or More; Pled Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Mazzei Cristina; 001; PC594(b)(1)-MISD-Vandalism $400 Or More; No Contest / Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Runde John; 001; PC594(b)(1)-MISD-Vandalism $400 Or More; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Call Jury Trial - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Pretrial - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Pay Fine and Assessments through Revenue Services.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • The Court finds a factual basis for the plea(s)..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant is released on O.R..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant waives the right to a hearing for probable cause. Additional Info: Comment for the arrest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Time waived for trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Burton, Jacob

    Read MoreRead Less