This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:34:49 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. FRANCIS RAYMOND SAN DIEGO CROOK

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against FRANCIS RAYMOND SAN DIEGO CROOK. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arraignment, - and Holt, Rachel E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arraignment, -

Holt, Rachel E.

 

Party Details

Defendant

CROOK, FRANCIS RAYMOND SAN DIEGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Warrant-Failed to Appear. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Arraignment - Hearing Time 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • CLETS Recall Printout.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Warrant Recalled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice of Release on Own Recognizance received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Bench Warrant Ordered. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Comment $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Failure To Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proposition 36 treatment eligible.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • AB208 Diversion Eligible.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less