This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:29:56 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Feliciano Djesus Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Feliciano Djesus Gutierrez. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Crim PJ, -, Runde, John, Chou, Danny Y., Finigan, Jeffrey R. and Jakubowski, Susan. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Crim PJ, -

Runde, John

Chou, Danny Y.

Finigan, Jeffrey R.

Jakubowski, Susan

 

Party Details

Defendant

Gutierrez, Feliciano Djesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Spano, Paula

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • Disposition: Prison Sentence; 001; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Prison Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 06/21/2018; Concurrent: Concurrent with count 4.; Term Type: Middle Term; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 22 Days; Conduct Credit: 22 Days; Condition - Adult; 1.; Fine(s) to be collected by the Department of Corrections. 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 2.; Parole revocation restitution fine pursuant to PC 1202.45,, stayed pending successful completion of parole. Amount: $300.00, 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 3.; Defendant shall register as required pursuant to PC 290, as, a sex offender., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 4.; Genetic marker testing pursuant to PC 296 is ordered., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 5.; Defendant not to be transported to, CDC prior to 08/09/18., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 6.; Defendant to pay restitution to victim(s) through CDCR as, directed. Ordered as follows: San Mateo Police Department in the amount of $700.00., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; Fee Totals; $400.00; Fee Totals; $400.00; 004; PC261.5(d)-FEL-Unlawful Sexual Intercourse; Prison Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Start Date: 06/21/2018; Concurrent: Concurrent with count 4.; Term Type: Middle Term; Term: 3 Years; Fee Totals; $70.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Condition - Adult; 1.; Terms and conditions apply to all convicted counts,, unless otherwise specified., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018; 008; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; Prison Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Start Date: 06/21/2018; Concurrent: Concurrent with count 4.; Term Type: Middle Term; Term: 2 Years; Fee Totals; $70.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Condition - Adult; 1.; Terms and conditions apply to all convicted counts,, unless otherwise specified., 06/21/2018, Active 06/21/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition; Judicial Officer; Finigan Jeffrey R.; 001; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Certified to Superior Court: PN859; 002; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 003; PC289(i)-FEL-Sexual Penetration By Foreign Object; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 004; PC261.5(d)-FEL-Unlawful Sexual Intercourse; Certified to Superior Court: PN859; 005; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 006; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 007; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 008; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; Certified to Superior Court: PN859; 009; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 010; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea; 011; PC288.3(a)-FEL-Contact With Minor For Sexual Offense; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Finigan Jeffrey R.; 001; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; No Contest / Nolo Contendere; 004; PC261.5(d)-FEL-Unlawful Sexual Intercourse; No Contest / Nolo Contendere; 008; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; No Contest / Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Jakubowski Susan; 001; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 002; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 003; PC289(i)-FEL-Sexual Penetration By Foreign Object; Not Guilty; 004; PC261.5(d)-FEL-Unlawful Sexual Intercourse; Not Guilty; 005; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 006; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; Not Guilty; 007; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 008; PC288a(b)(2)-FEL-Oral Copulation Of A Person Under 16; Not Guilty; 009; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 010; PC288(c)(1)-FEL-Lewd Act Upon A Child; Not Guilty; 011; PC288.3(a)-FEL-Contact With Minor For Sexual Offense; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Proof of Firearms Ammo Relinquishment and Restitution Report. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Crim PJ - Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment (Static 99 - HIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • JUS 8715 forwarded to the Department of Justice. Additional Info: Comment and Arresting Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment filed - State Prison.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Probation is denied..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Arraignment for sentencing waived..

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant waives the right to a hearing for probable cause. Additional Info: Comment for the arrest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Bail set at. Additional Info: Comment $525000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Protective order pursuant to Section 136.2 ordered and filed. Additional Info: Comment Protection Order In Criminal Proceedings Pursuant To Sec. 136.2 Of The Penal Code Ordered And Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Confidential Criminal Protective Order Filed. Additional Info: Comment Type of Order: No Contact

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Gutierrez, Feliciano Djesus

    Read MoreRead Less