This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:32:58 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. ENRUN LIN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against ENRUN LIN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Crim PJ, - and Garratt, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Crim PJ, -

Garratt, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Defendant

LIN, ENRUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KIM, FRANK H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Garratt Stephanie; 001; PC664/187(a)-FEL-Attempted:Murder; Not Guilty; 001; PC12022.7(a)-ENH-Special Allegation-Great Bodily Injury; Deny; 001; PC12022(b)(1)-ENH-Special Allegation-Use Of Deadly Weapon; Deny; 001; PC1203.075(a)-ENH-Great Bodily Injury; Deny; 001; PC1203(k)-ENH-Special Allegation-On Felony Probation; Deny; 001; PC1192.7(c)-ENH-Serious Felony; Deny; 001; PC667.5(c)-ENH-Special Allegation-Prior-Any Felony; Deny; 002; PC245(a)(1)-FEL-Assault With A Deadly Weapon; Deny; 002; PC12022.7(a)-ENH-Special Allegation-Great Bodily Injury; Deny; 003; PC245(a)(4)-FEL-Assault By Means Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; 003; PC12022.7(a)-ENH-Special Allegation-Great Bodily Injury; Deny; 003; PC12022(b)(1)-ENH-Special Allegation-Use Of Deadly Weapon; Deny; 004; PC203-FEL-Mayhem; Not Guilty; 004; PC12022(b)(1)-ENH-Special Allegation-Use Of Deadly Weapon; Deny; 004; PC1192.7(c)-ENH-Serious Felony; Deny; 005; PC245(a)(4)-FEL-Assault By Means Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; 006; PC136.1(a)(1)-FEL-Dissuading A Witness From Testifying; Not Guilty; 006; PC12022.1-ENH-Felony Committed While Released On Bail Or O.R.; Deny; 006; PC1192.7(c)-ENH-Serious Felony; Deny; 007; PC137(a)-FEL-Bribery Of Witness; Not Guilty; 007; PC12022.1-ENH-Felony Committed While Released On Bail Or O.R.; Deny; 008; PC166(a)(4)-MISD-Disobeying Court Order; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Crim PJ - Hearing Time 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Garratt Stephanie Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Fingerprint Card filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Bail set at. Additional Info: Comment $5 MILLION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Time waived for trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant handed preliminary hearing transcript..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment waived on Information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment on Information. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Garratt Stephanie Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: LIN, ENRUNAttorney: KIM, FRANK H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing Transcript filed. Additional Info: Comment VOLUME 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing Transcript filed. Additional Info: Comment VOLUME 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Information Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Bail bond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Bail bond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less