This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:28:19 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. DONNA MARIE PEDERSON

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against DONNA MARIE PEDERSON. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Crim PJ, -, Runde, John and Holt, Rachel E.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********78-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Crim PJ, -

Runde, John

Holt, Rachel E.

 

Party Details

Defendant

PEDERSON, DONNA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GREEN, KRISTEN E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • Disposition: Probation Sentence; 001; PC4573(a)-FEL-Bringing Contraband Into The Jail; Probation Sentence; Probation; Type: Formal (Supervised); Start Date: 06/13/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/13/2021; Status; Active; 06/13/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 06/13/2018; Term Type: Jail Time; Term: 90 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 13 Days; Conduct Credit: 12 Days; Fee Totals; $400.00; $100.00; Fee Totals; $500.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition; Judicial Officer; Holt Rachel E.; 001; PC4573(a)-FEL-Bringing Contraband Into The Jail; Certified to Superior Court: PN859; 002; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Holt Rachel E.; 001; PC4573(a)-FEL-Bringing Contraband Into The Jail; No Contest / Nolo Contendere.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Runde John; 001; PC4573(a)-FEL-Bringing Contraband Into The Jail; Not Guilty; 002; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Proof of Firearm and Ammunition Relinquishment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Crim PJ - Hearing Time 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Judge Offer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Plea entered pursuant to PC 859A. Defendant waives his/her. Additional Info: Comment right to a preliminary hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • No legal cause.. Additional Info: Comment Defendant stated there is no legal cause why sentence should not now be pronounced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Arraignment for sentencing waived..

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant waives the right to a hearing for probable cause. Additional Info: Comment for the arrest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Time not waived by defendant/counsel..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Probable Cause Declaration received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: PEDERSON, DONNA MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less