Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:28:54 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. DAVID EARL SANDERS

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against DAVID EARL SANDERS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Southern Call Jury Trial, - and Southern Pretrial, -. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Southern Call Jury Trial, -

Southern Pretrial, -

 

Party Details

Defendant

SANDERS, DAVID EARL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Fineman Nancy L.; 001; HS11377(a)-MISD-Possessing A Controlled Substance; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Southern Call Jury Trial - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Southern Pretrial - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Time waived for trial..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: SANDERS, DAVID EARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less