Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:31:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Daniel Keith Tavake

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Keith Tavake. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R., Runde, John, Forcum, Mark R., Garratt, Stephanie, Fineman, Nancy L. and Brown, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R.

Runde, John

Forcum, Mark R.

Garratt, Stephanie

Fineman, Nancy L.

Brown, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Defendant

Tavake, Daniel Keith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Johnston, William R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Runde John; 001; PC490.2-MISD-Petty Theft; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • To Trail. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Garratt Stephanie Hearing Time 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Matter to trail case number:. Additional Info: Comment 18SF005500A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • To Trail. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Brown Gilbert Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment 18SF005500A Parties Present Defendant: Tavake, Daniel Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Matter to trail case number:. Additional Info: Comment 18SF005500A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • To Trail. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Tavake, Daniel KeithPrivate Defender: Johnston, William R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Forcum Mark R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Matter to trail case number:. Additional Info: Comment 18SF005500A

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Bail set at. Additional Info: Comment $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Defendant waives the right to a hearing for probable cause. Additional Info: Comment for the arrest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Time not waived by defendant/counsel..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Private Defender Appointed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Runde John Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Tavake, Daniel Keith

    Read MoreRead Less