This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:29:15 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Christian Tarol Scott

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Christian Tarol Scott. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Borja, Hugo R., Novak, Lisa A., Holt, Rachel E. and Mazzei, Cristina. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********37-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Borja, Hugo R.

Novak, Lisa A.

Holt, Rachel E.

Mazzei, Cristina

 

Party Details

Defendant

Scott, Christian Tarol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ruiz, Nancy J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition; Judicial Officer; Borja Hugo R.; 001; HS11364-MISD-Possession Of Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal: Negotiated Plea.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Disposition: Plea; Judicial Officer; Fineman Nancy L.; 001; HS11364-MISD-Possession Of Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Case dismissed pursuant to plea.. Additional Info: Comment On motion of the PROSECUTION pursuant to plea on case number:18NM6442A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Harvey Waiver.. Additional Info: Comment Dismissed count(s) may be considered at time of sentencing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Conference held..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Pretrial Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Scott, Christian TarolAttorney: Ruiz, Nancy J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Pretrial Services Report.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • CLETS Recall Printout.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Warrant Recalled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Warrant-Failed to Appear. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Holt Rachel E. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Scott, Christian Tarol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Bench Warrant Ordered. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Comment $7,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Failure To Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less