Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:36:18 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Carmine Samperi

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Carmine Samperi. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Northern Superior Court Review, -, Northern Prelim, - and Bouliane, Anne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Northern Superior Court Review, -

Northern Prelim, -

Bouliane, Anne

 

Party Details

Defendant

Samperi, Carmine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Preliminary Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Prelim - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 60 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Superior Court Review. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Northern Superior Court Review - Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Defendant remains on bail..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Defendant ordered to return..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Time waiver for preliminary hearing.. Additional Info: Comment Defendant personally waived time for 10 court days and 60 calendar days for the preliminary hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment waived on complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Advisement of Rights.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Attorney appeared on behalf of defendant. Additional Info: Comment J Cueva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment 977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Waiver of personal appearance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Bouliane Anne Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Defendant: Samperi, Carmine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Bail bond filed.

    Read MoreRead Less