This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 11:36:29 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. ALEXIS VERBOONEN

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against ALEXIS VERBOONEN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L. and Arraignment, -. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********82-A

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Arraignment, -

 

Party Details

Defendant

VERBOONEN, ALEXIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • To Trail. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Arraignment - Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment 17-SM-006754-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Warrant issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Bench Warrant Ordered. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Comment $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Failure To Appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Arraignment. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Promise to Appear received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Efiling - Initial.

    Read MoreRead Less