This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 02:26:05 (UTC).

THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC vs. VICTOR VALENCIA, et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 THE BEST SERVICE CO , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTOR VALENCIA,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4889

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC

Defendants

VALENCIA, VICTOR

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAPLETON, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-042129-HOJ The Best Service Co., Inc. $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; THE BEST SERVICE CO., INC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stapleton, Christopher