This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 15:54:24 (UTC).

TERESA MICHELLE BROWN vs. GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 TERESA MICHELLE BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5485

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN, TERESA MICHELLE

Defendants

GEERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

PUTNAM CHEVROLET CADILLAC, LLC

PUTNAM CHEVROLET CADILLAC, a California Limited Liability Company

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ, CHRISTOPHER M.

Defendant Attorney

BRAR, DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: NI Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: NICOLE STAUSS/ PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: CHERYL PUTNAM/ PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-046936-HOJ GEERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: CHERYL PUTNAM/ PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED TO: NI Comment COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED TO: NICOLE STAUSS/ PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROWN, TERESA MICHELLE : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-042132-HOJ Brown, Teresa Michelle $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BROWN, TERESA MICHELLE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: BROWN, TERESA MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUTNAM CHEVROLET CADILLAC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARSHNIK BRAR