This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:21 (UTC).

TECHI CARREON VS LORETO CARRIAGA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 TECHI CARREON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LORETO CARRIAGA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6196

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARREON, TECHI

Defendants

CARRIAGA, LORETO

CARRIAGA, OSCAR

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIRRONE, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AS TO LOR Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AS TO LORETO CARRIAGA OSCAR CARRIAGA.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AS TO ALL Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON SERVED ON LORET Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON SERVED ON LORETO CARRIAGA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/30/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. Comment PSUO: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 FILED. TYPE OF SERVICE: POSTING/MAILING DATE: 06/30/12

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON SERVED ON OSCAR Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON SERVED ON OSCAR CARRIAGA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/30/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Conversion Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CARREON TECHI; Awarded Against: CARRIAGA, LORETO; CARRIAGA, OSCAR; ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/20/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON FOR TECHI CARREON JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AGAINST LORETO CARRIAGA, OSCAR CARRIAGA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 136 SHIPLEY AVENUE DALY CITY CA. 94015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/20/12 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120720-0042-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 136 SHIPLEY AVENUE DALY CITY CA. 94015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON AGAINST LORETO CARRIAGA OSCAR CARRIAGA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CARREON FOR TECHI CARREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JOAF1: JUDGMENT ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES: Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice. Additional Info: Comment UDN: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING NOTICES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES PER CCP 1161.2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $63.70; ADDRESS 136 SHIPLEY AVENUE DALY CITY CA. 94015; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0012-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 136 SHIPLEY AVENUE DALY CITY CA94015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CARREON, TECHI : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270012 CARREON, TECHI $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CARREON, TECHI : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CARREON, TECHI; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less