This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 15:24:22 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. JANETTE A EBREO, et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JANETTE A EBREO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3635

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendants

EBREO, JANETTE A A

DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLUSIVE

EBREO, JANETTE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOONE, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027186-HOJ TD Bank USA, N.A. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE