This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 23:51:49 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank vs. LENKA SINSKA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 TD Bank USA, N A , as successor in interest to Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LENKA SINSKA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3630

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank

Defendants

SINSKA, LENKA

DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLSUIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOONE, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank; SINSKA, LENKA; DOES 1 THROUGH 15, INCLSUIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027180-HOJ TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; TD Bank USA, N.A., as successor in interest to Target National Bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue.; Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC - STEPHANIE BOONE