This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:44:20 (UTC).

TAMARA M. PEREZ vs. RAIED YOUSEF GHEITH, et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2016 TAMARA M PEREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RAIED YOUSEF GHEITH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E., Etezadi, Susan I. and Buchwald, Gerald J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0972

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Etezadi, Susan I.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ, TAMARA M.

Defendants

GOODFELLAS PIZZA & PASTA

GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF

UPPER CRUST DELI

DOES 1-30

DOES 1-30, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, PARVIZ

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS, AMY K.

MITZEL, KRISTA L

FONG, MARY H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Order.

Order Type: RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES Signed Comment Type: RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES Signed by: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 06/14/17 (COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR)

Notice.

Notice OF JURY FEES Comment OF JURY FEES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice REGARDING DEFANDANT'S REPRESENTATION AND COUNSEL OF RECORD Comment REGARDING DEFANDANT'S REPRESENTATION AND COUNSEL OF RECORD

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ETC. SUBSERVED TO JOHN DOE, ETC. Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, ETC. SUBSERVED TO JOHN DOE, ETC.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal 8/14/18 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal 8/14/18

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATE Comment GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES.

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES.

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: AMY THOMAS New Attorney: MARY FONG Comment Former Attorney: AMY THOMAS New Attorney: MARY FONG

Association of Counsel / Attorney.

Association of Counsel / Attorney KRISTA MITZEL AND MARY FONG WITH THE MITZEL GROUP, LLP Comment KRISTA MITZEL AND MARY FONG, WITH THE MITZEL GROUP, LLP

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S REPRESENTATION AND COUNSEL OF RECOR Comment ANSWER, NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S REPRESENTATION AND COUNSEL OF RECORD

Complaint.

Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: PEREZ TAMARA M.; GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF; DOES 1 THROUGH 30, INCLUSIVE; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF ENTIRE ACTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONDITIONAL.).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 7 DAYS. PER ORDER FILED ON 6.14.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Other Comment PER ORDER FILED ON 6.14.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Court Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal 8/14/18 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal 8/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • Financial info for FONG, MARY H : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Financial: FONG, MARY H; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-055154-HOJ GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial: GHEITH, RAIED YOUSEF; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for PEREZ, TAMARA M. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-069001-HOJ PEREZ, TAMARA M. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Financial info for PEREZ, TAMARA M. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Financial info for PEREZ, TAMARA M. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-037340-HOJ VISUAL DATA RESEARCH $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Financial info for PEREZ, TAMARA M. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Financial: PEREZ, TAMARA M.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less