This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:56:57 (UTC).

SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO VS RENATO CUSIMANO ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENATO CUSIMANO ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5892

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC

SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

RENATO CUSIMANO

DIANE WELCHCUSIMANO

DESEO

CUSIMANO, RENATO

WELCHCUSIMANO, DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, DAVID J.

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

(U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SYSCO SAN F Comment NARAO: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC AS Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC AS TO DIANE WELCHCUSIMANO, BY SUB-SERVING RENATO CUSIMANO. MAILING DATE OF 08/31/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Document.

EXHIBIT "B" TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. Comment FILED: EXHIBIT "B" TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC SERVED Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC SERVED ON RENATO CUSIMANO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/22/12.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

(L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AS TO RENATO CUSIMANO DIANE WELCHCUSIMANO FILED BY SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Writ of Attachment. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: LM HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AS TO RENATO CUSIMANO DIANE WELCHCUSIMANO FILED BY SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC SERVED Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC SERVED ON RENATO CUSIMANO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/22/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC AS Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC AS TO DIANE WELCHCUSIMANO, BY SUB-SERVING RENATO CUSIMANO. MAILING DATE OF 08/31/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT Comment DEC: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF ATTACH ORDER AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SYSCO SAN F Comment NARAO: NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120829-0600-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: EXHIBIT "B" TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. Comment FILED: EXHIBIT "B" TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120815-0317-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Financial info for SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201208290600 SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Financial info for SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201208150317 SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial info for SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • Financial: SYSCO SAN FRANCISCO, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less