This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 14:24:37 (UTC).

SUSAN POWELL VS. SHELLY KAY PLATH

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 SUSAN POWELL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHELLY KAY PLATH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R, Jakubowski, Susan M, Borja, Hugo R. and Jakubowski, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1407

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Jakubowski, Susan M

Borja, Hugo R.

Jakubowski, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL, SUSAN

Defendant

PLATH, SHELLY KAY

Not Classified By Court

Payor

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF POWELL FILED

Document.

FILING (30) Comment FILED: FRANCOIS X. SORBA'S DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (2) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SUSAN POWELL IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY AFTER JUDGMENT

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY (2) Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY FRANCOIS X. SORBA REMOVED AS TO SUSAN POWELL AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER.

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SUSAN POWELL.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JCAT: JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER TRIAL FILED AND ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER (4) Comment ANS3: (L-UD) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF POWELL FILED BY SHELLY KAY PLATH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

Conversion Action.

WRIT (12) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S SUSAN POWELL, DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR A STAY, FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY PRO/PER REMOVED AS TO SUSAN POWELL AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY FRANCOIS X. SORBA.

Document.

FILING (28) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S SUSAN POWELL, MOTION IN LIMINE, FILED.

Conversion Action.

FILING (2) Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY SUSAN POWELL. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S)

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET (2) Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY SUSAN POWELL GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00 SIGNED BY M.MARLOWE ON 07/16/15.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: POWELL SUSAN; Awarded Against: PLATH, SHELLY KAY; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/17/15 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF POWELL FOR SUSAN POWELL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF POWELL AGAINST SHELLY KAY PLATH PAST DUE RENT OF $1,280.00. COSTS ARE $90.00. JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 2116 OLYMPIC WAY DALY CITY CA. 94015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF POWELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/17/15 -- PARTIALLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (12) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EVICTION DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (3) Comment FILED: PLAINTIFF'S SUSAN POWELL, DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR A STAY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (30) Comment FILED: FRANCOIS X. SORBA'S DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities. Additional Info: MEMO (2) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY SUSAN POWELL IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY AFTER JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: ATTORNEY (2) Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY FRANCOIS X. SORBA REMOVED AS TO SUSAN POWELL AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150826-0489-CS 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 2116 OLYMPIC WAY DALY CITY CA94015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for PLATH, SHELLY KAY : Case Payment Receipt # 201508260489 PLATH, SHELLY KAY $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • Financial info for PLATH, SHELLY KAY : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial info for PLATH, SHELLY KAY : Case Payment Receipt # 201507210294 PLATH, SHELLY KAY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial info for PLATH, SHELLY KAY : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Financial: PLATH, SHELLY KAY; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Case Payment Receipt # 201508180522 Payor $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial info for Payor : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Financial: Payor; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Payor is a litigant