This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 08:03:13 (UTC).

Susan Kogel vs. Southwest Airlines Co., et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 Susan Kogel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Southwest Airlines Co ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond, Reyna, Renee C and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1717

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Reyna, Renee C

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kogel, Susan

Defendants

Southwest Airlines Co.

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

Defendant Attorney

MARTORANO, REBEKKA R

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/11/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/11/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 3/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF Comment Case Management Conference - 3/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Kogel, Susan; Southwest Airlines Co.; DOES 1 TO 20; Comment: FILED ON 12/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket2nd Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 01/24/2022 per Mr. Kass's office by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketADR Private Settlement Conference Scheduled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket3rd Time Extension granted for Filing of Stipulation to ADR.; Additional Info: Comment Until 07/21/2021 per P's atty by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 10/25/21 per P's atty by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket2nd Time Extension granted for Filing of Stipulation to ADR.; Additional Info: Comment Until 06/30/2021 per P's atty by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket1st Time Extension granted for Filing of Stipulation to ADR.; Additional Info: Comment Until 06/09/2021 per P's by LC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CMC 11/18/20 Comment CMC 11/18/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kogel, Susan; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-017689-HOJ Kogel, Susan $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kogel, Susan; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Kogel, Susan; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less