This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 17:38:35 (UTC).

STEVEN LY vs SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 STEVEN LY filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L, Weiner, Marie S, DAVIS, Weiner, Marie S. and Fineman, Nancy L.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5889

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

DAVIS

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Weiner, Marie S

Weiner, Marie S.

Fineman, Nancy L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LY, STEVEN

Defendants

SWENSON, SUSAN G.

HOCHSCHILD, MAURICE

WALKER, JAMES

SOMIN TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

NATIONAL SECURITIES CORPORATION

KNEUER, JOHN

PLASCHKE, ROBERT

OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC.

DOES 1 - 25, INCLUSIVE

LAKE STREET CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC

JOHNSON, JEFFREY D.

HOWE, ALAN

YOUNG, KENNY

SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHREIN, REED R

 

Court Documents

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 10/23/19 Comment Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 10/23/19

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SE Comment ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATION RE Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATION RE COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1; AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Order.

Order ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF MATTHEW W. CLOSE IN SUPPORT OF SONIM TECHNOLOGIES INC.'S MOTI Comment DECLARATION OF MATTHEW W. CLOSE IN SUPPORT OF SONIM TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION AND PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of QUESTIONALBLE - AUTHORIZED AGENT NOT STATED Comment QUESTIONALBLE - AUTHORIZED AGENT NOT STATED

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE C Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE COMPLEX CASE

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SE Comment ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order Comment ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order OF COMPLEX STATUS CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1 Comment OF COMPLEX STATUS CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

Order.

Order ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE C Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE COMPLEX CASE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGESigned by: JUDGE DAVISDate Signed: 10/23/19 Comment Type: GRANTING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 10/23/19

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Peremptory Challenge Comment CLASS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SE Comment ENTRY OF ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order Comment ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED COMPLEX CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order.; Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order OF COMPLEX STATUS CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1 Comment OF COMPLEX STATUS CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Consolidated; Comment; Comment: (CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER 19-CIV-05564)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase Consolidation Granted.; Additional Info: Comment Lead Case: 19CIV05564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment Order Re-Assigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes Comment ReAssigning Case To Judge For All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE C Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE COMPLEX CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LY, STEVEN; Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LY, STEVEN; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; LY, STEVEN; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Re: Complex Case Designation.; Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClass Action Complex Notice.; Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPPENHEIMER & CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where National Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonim Technologies, Inc. is a litigant