This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 09:57:15 (UTC).

STEPHANIE ROSEN VS MYCHELLE LEUTBECHER ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2010 STEPHANIE ROSEN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MYCHELLE LEUTBECHER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Elizabeth K, Swope, V Raymond, Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Novak, Lisa A, Buchwald, Gerald J, Bergeron, Joseph E, Scott, Joseph C, Buchwald, Gerald J., Swope, V. Raymond, Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A., Scott, Joseph C. and Lee, Elizabeth K.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7737

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Elizabeth K

Swope, V Raymond

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Novak, Lisa A

Buchwald, Gerald J

Bergeron, Joseph E

Scott, Joseph C

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Swope, V. Raymond

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Scott, Joseph C.

Lee, Elizabeth K.

 

Party Details

Defendants

LEUTBECHER, MYCHELLE

MENASCO, KEN

KING WAH RESTAURANT, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

101 CONSTRUCTION

CHEN, RUO HUI

CHEN, XIAO YAN

MORELAND, LLC

COOK, CHRIS

MENASCO, JAMES KENNETH

COOK, CHRISTOPHER

HUANG, LI ZHEN

LI, JAMES

CHEN, FAY

LI, JAMES JIN Q

KING WAH RESTAURANT

CHEN, RUO WU

MENASCO, NIKII

ZHEN, LI-LING

MENASCO, NIKII TORRES

CHEN, JOE

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KASS, BRADLEY

MILLER, RAYMOND R

JIANG, DANNING

LEADER-PICONE, MALCOLM

Other Attorneys

MILLER, LAWRENCE D.

 

Court Documents

Notice.

NOTICE (23) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORD/NTC OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT FILED BY STEPHANIE ROSEN.

Document.

FILING (11) Comment FILED: REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFLT-101 CONST INC (ALREADY DEFAULTED ON 062212), FILED.

Document.

FILING (10) Comment FILED: REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFLT-PACIFIC VIEW LLC (ALREADY DEFAULTED ON 062212), FILED.

Document.

FILING (8) Comment FILED: CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS BY ONE SAN BRUNO ET. AL, FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER (4) Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN FILED BY KEN MENASCO NIKII MENASCO, MYCHELLE LEUTBECHER, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (3) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RUO HUI CHEN MORELAND SAN BRUNO, LLC IN SUPPORT OF DEM. TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (8) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MABEL ZHEN.

Opposition.

OPPOSITION Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF MABEL ZHEN FILED BY STEPHANIE ROSEN

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN AS TO 101 CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

Document.

FILING (18) Comment FILED: SPECIAL OBJECTION SUPPLEMENTAL DECL OF BRADLEY KASS ESQ IN OPP TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (4) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY STEPHANIE ROSEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSE

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE (7) Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER SERVED ON SEE LIST BY FAX WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/13.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (13) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RUO HUI CHEN LI ZHEN HUANG, KING WAH RESTAURANT, INC, MORELAND SAN BRUNO, LLC, 101 CONSTRUCTION CO., INC, YAP PEI CHAN, XIAO YAN CHEN, ONE SAN BRUNO, LLC.

Ex Parte.

APPLICATION Comment EPA: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY STEPHANIE ROSEN

Order.

ORDER (5) Comment O: ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER OF MORE ESTATES SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE ON 01/08/13, FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (4) Comment PSM: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN SERVED ON CHRISTOPHER DANIEL COOK FILED; DATE OF MAILING: 03/24/12

General Denial filed.

(S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN FILED BY MYCHELLE LEUTBECHER KEN MENASCO, Comment GD: (S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN FILED BY MYCHELLE LEUTBECHER, KEN MENASCO, NIKII MENASCO, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

General Denial filed.

(S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN FILED BY MABEL ZHEN REPRESENTED BY MALCOL Comment GD: (S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ROSEN FILED BY MABEL ZHEN, REPRESENTED BY MALCOLM LEADER-PICONE

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: CHEN RUO HUI; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MENASCO, NIKII; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MENASCO, KEN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: KING WAH RESTAURANT, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: LEUTBECHER, MYCHELLE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CHAN, YAP PEI; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CHEN, XIAO YAN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ONE SAN BRUNO, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CHEN, RUO WU; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HUANG, LI ZHEN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ROSEN, STEPHANIE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: MORE ESTATES LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: COOK, CHRISTOPHER DANIEL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MORELAND SAN BRUNO, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: ZHEN MABEL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Bankruptcy Stay; Party; Name: LI JAMES JIN Q; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: ZHAO WEI-LIN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: 101 CONSTRUCTION CO. INC A CALIFORNIA CORP; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: RUSSAW, EDWARD, JR; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PACIFIC VIEW, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MORELAND, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
984 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2014
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201403200318 ROSEN, STEPHANIE $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201403200297 ROSEN, STEPHANIE $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201304240519 ROSEN, STEPHANIE $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201208310389 ROSEN, STEPHANIE $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201008110085 ROSEN, STEPHANIE $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • Financial info for ROSEN, STEPHANIE : Transaction Assessment $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • Financial: ROSEN, STEPHANIE; Total Financial Assessment $1,095.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,095.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORELAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, LAWRENCE D