This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 03:56:59 (UTC).

Stephanie Allan vs. RV VI 777 MARINERS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Stephanie Allan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RV VI 777 MARINERS LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Buchwald, Gerald J., Grandsaert, John L, Buchwald, Gerald J, Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0129

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Grandsaert, John L

Buchwald, Gerald J

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allan, Stephanie

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NEWARK & COMPANY REAL ESTATE, INC.

RV VI 777 MARINERS LLC

DOES 1 TO 5

ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE PARTNERS, INC

G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATTERMOLE, GREGORY C.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MIRSHAFEI, KAVEH

HUTTO, JESSE

HOBSON, SUSAN H

ORTIZ, KEVIN M.

SCHELEY, P. CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable.

Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;NOTICE OF CASE MA Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADR INFORMATION PACKET by serving AMBER SMITH PROCESS SPECIALIST

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE (NO TITLE OF PERSON SER Comment SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE (NO TITLE OF PERSON SERVED AND ALSO NO DATE OF MAILING)

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

eFiled Complaint Complaint

Complaint.

eFiled Complaint Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

eFiled Civil Case Sheet/Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

Notice.

Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED-CMC STIP AND ORDER FORWARDED TO DEPT. 34 Comment STIP AND ORDER FORWARDED TO DEPT. 34

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement. Requesting associated template form. Comment Requesting associated template form.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE (NO TITLE OF PERSON SER Comment SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE (NO TITLE OF PERSON SERVED AND ALSO NO DATE OF MAILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Allan, Stephanie : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-001270-HOJ Allan, Stephanie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Allan, Stephanie : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Allan, Stephanie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G&E REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE PARTNERS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORTIZ KEVIN M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTTO, JESSE