Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 00:06:58 (UTC).

STEFAN ZUCKUT vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 STEFAN ZUCKUT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0847

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUCKUT, STEFAN

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO COVID-19 Comment HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO COVID-19

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

Returned Unserved by Certified Mail.

Returned Unserved by Certified Mail Hearing Date: 1/8/2021 Comment Hearing Date: 1/8/2021

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Small Claims - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO COVID-19 Comment HEARING RESCHEDULED DUE TO COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Unserved by Certified Mail. Additional Info: Returned Unserved by Certified Mail Hearing Date: 1/8/2021 Comment Hearing Date: 1/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZUCKUT, STEFAN : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-036226-HOJ ZUCKUT, STEFAN $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZUCKUT, STEFAN : Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ZUCKUT, STEFAN : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: ZUCKUT, STEFAN; Total Financial Assessment $90.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant