This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:22 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. JORGE BAUTISTA ZUNIGA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JORGE BAUTISTA ZUNIGA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2822

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE

ZUNIGA, JORGE BAUTISTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L, II

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L., II

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; ZUNIGA JORGE BAUTISTA; DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Financial info for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037501-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less