This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:17:03 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, et al vs. Car Post Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Car Post Inc. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3975

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Car Post Inc

DOES 1 - 40 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHFOUZ, RICHARD L., II

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED EVILSIZO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED EVILSIZOR - RONALD C. CHAUVEL - AGENT FOR SERVICE

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED EVILSIZO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED EVILSIZOR - RONALD C. CHAUVEL - AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036358-HOJ State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less