This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:54:19 (UTC).

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs. ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5482

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ANKER WIRELESS, INC.

ANKER INNOVATIONS, LTD.

ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

BEST CASE AND ACCESSORIES, INC.

SHARPER IMAGE

SHARPER IMAGE CORPORATION

CAMELOT SI, LLC

ATOMI, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAXWELL, MIRIAM P

Defendant Attorneys

FRUMAN, HARVEY

FINN, BRIAN J

NUDELMAN, JESSICA A

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 3 as CAMELOT SI LLC DBA SHARPER IMAGE Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 3 as CAMELOT SI, LLC DBA SHARPER IMAGE

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as SHARPER IMAGE CORPORATION Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as SHARPER IMAGE CORPORATION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by BY MAIL AND ACKNOLWEDMENT IS QUESTIONABLE MUST SPECIFY PERSON OR AGENT SERVED Comment BY MAIL AND ACKNOLWEDMENT IS QUESTIONABLE, MUST SPECIFY PERSON OR AGENT SERVED

Proof of Service by.

Proof of Service by BY MAIL AND ACKNOLWEDMENT IS QUESTIONABLE MUST SPECIFY PERSON OR AGENT SERVED Comment BY MAIL AND ACKNOLWEDMENT IS QUESTIONABLE, MUST SPECIFY PERSON OR AGENT SERVED

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AMENDED TO COMPLAINT (PLS SEE PAGE TWO O Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AMENDED TO COMPLAINT (PLS SEE PAGE TWO OF DOC FOR MORE DOCS SERVED)

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 2 as ATOMI INC Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 2 as ATOMI, INC

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/21/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice.

Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO BEST CASE AND ACCESSORIES INC ONLY); Party; Name: BEST CASE AND ACCESSORIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, AMENDED TO COMPLAINT (PLS SEE PAGE TWO O Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AMENDED TO COMPLAINT (PLS SEE PAGE TWO OF DOC FOR MORE DOCS SERVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint. Additional Info: Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 3 as CAMELOT SI LLC DBA SHARPER IMAGE Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 3 as CAMELOT SI, LLC DBA SHARPER IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties). Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint. Additional Info: Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 2 as ATOMI INC Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 2 as ATOMI, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint. Additional Info: Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as SHARPER IMAGE CORPORATION Comment NAMING DOE/ROE 1 as SHARPER IMAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for ANKER INNOVATIONS, LTD. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial: ANKER INNOVATIONS, LTD.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-003164-HOJ FRUMAN, HARVEY $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-003163-HOJ FRUMAN, HARVEY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial: ANKER TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Financial info for STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-066412-HOJ MAXWELL, MIRIAM P $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Financial info for STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Financial: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anker Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ATOMI, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Anker Innovations Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant