This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 13:22:50 (UTC).

SOPHIA ANDRITSAKIS VS. DAVID J. KAPLAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 SOPHIA ANDRITSAKIS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DAVID J KAPLAN,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KARESH, Scott, Joseph C, Grandsaert, John L, STEVEN L. DYLINA, DUBOIS, GREENBERG, Dylina, Steven L, ETEZADI, DuBois, Richard H, SUSAN I. ETEZADI, Etezadi, Susan I, Karesh, Jonathan E and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7530

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

KARESH

Scott, Joseph C

Grandsaert, John L

STEVEN L. DYLINA

DUBOIS

GREENBERG

Dylina, Steven L

ETEZADI

DuBois, Richard H

SUSAN I. ETEZADI

Etezadi, Susan I

Karesh, Jonathan E

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA

Defendants

ST. MATTHEWS SURGERY CENTER, LLC

FOOT CARE SPECIALISTS, INC., A PODIATRY GROUP

KAPLAN, DAVID J

FOOTCARE SPECIALIST, INC

KAPLAN, D.P.M., DAVID J.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jong, Jesse

ADEYANJU, EDIRIVERERE PATIENCE

Defendant Attorneys

REINHOLTZ, JACK R

Fierro, Lauren Diane

CURLEY, ARTHUR W.

GIBSON, MARK R

 

Court Documents

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DE Comment Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT. Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 08/30/18

Declaration.

Declaration OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 10/23/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARIN Comment DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/11/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Amended Complaint.

Amended Complaint FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES Comment FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Declaration.

Declaration OF BRYAN J. HARRISON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment OF BRYAN J. HARRISON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARIN Comment DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 10/23/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/11/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Declaration.

Declaration OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DE Comment Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT. Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 08/30/18

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing OSC RE DISMISSAL 9-11-18 Comment OSC RE DISMISSAL 9-11-18

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHO Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION IN LIMINE #1

451 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA; KAPLAN, DAVID J; ST. MATTHEWS SURGERY CENTER, LLC; FOOTCARE SPECIALIST, INC; DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support.; Additional Info: Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARIN Comment DECLARATION OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 10/23/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/11/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment OF BRYAN J. HARRISON RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DE Comment Type: GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT. Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 08/30/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
352 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ANDRITSAKIS SERVED ON DAVID J KAPLAN WITH S Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF ANDRITSAKIS SERVED ON DAVID J KAPLAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/17/16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA; Case Payment Receipt # 201602250457 ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; ANDRITSAKIS, SOPHIA; Total Financial Assessment $1,155.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160225-0457-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Patience Adeyanju