This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 13:01:10 (UTC).

SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION vs. COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COUNTY OF SAN MATEO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0206

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION

Respondents

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, BUILDING AND PLANNING DEPARTMENT

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

DOES 3-100, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1-100

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BERLIN, GREGORY S.

Respondent Attorneys

BEIERS, JOHN C.

Andrikopoulos, Melissa Duncan

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate.

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice.

Notice TO ATTORNEY GENERAL Comment TO ATTORNEY GENERAL

Notice.

Notice OF REQUEST FOR HEARING Comment OF REQUEST FOR HEARING

Notice.

Notice PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Comment PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

Notice.

Notice OF SETTLEMENT MEETING Comment OF SETTLEMENT MEETING

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION; COUNTY OF SAN MATEO; COUNTY OF SAN MATEO BUILDING AND PLANNING DEPARTMENT; DOES 1 THROUGH 100; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE PETITION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice OF SETTLEMENT MEETING Comment OF SETTLEMENT MEETING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition for Writ of Mandate File Date 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Comment PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice OF REQUEST FOR HEARING Comment OF REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice TO ATTORNEY GENERAL Comment TO ATTORNEY GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate. Additional Info: Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial info for SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-002524-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial info for SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial: SMC MARIJUANA MORATORIUM COALITION; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berlin, Gregory S