Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 02:23:07 (UTC).

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION VS CEM BUILDERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2012 S J AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CEM BUILDERS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Swope, V Raymond, Foiles, Robert D, Bergeron, Joseph E, Buchwald, Gerald J, Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Buchwald, Gerald J., Weiner, Marie S., Swope, V. Raymond, Dylina, Steven L. and Scott, Joseph C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1216

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Swope, V Raymond

Foiles, Robert D

Bergeron, Joseph E

Buchwald, Gerald J

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Weiner, Marie S.

Swope, V. Raymond

Dylina, Steven L.

Scott, Joseph C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO INC

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAMMER & STEEL INC

VIGILANT INSURANCE

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO INC

CEM BUILDERS INC

CEM BUILDERS, INC

CEM BUILDERS

TUCKER ENGINEERING

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION

PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERS BOARD

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CEM BUILDERS, INC

CEM BUILDERS

TUCKER ENGINEERING

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY A PURPORTED IOWA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VILLA PARK LASING CORP

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CEM BUILDERS, INC

GONSALVES & STRONCK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

TUCKER ENGINEERING

PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERBOARD

CALIFORNIA CAISSONS & SHORING,INC.

NORTHERN CALIF DISTRICT COUNCIL OF LABORERS on behalf of itself and on behalf of

VIGILANT INSURANCE

MATHESON, LESLEY RICE

ROSSI, DAVID BRANDON

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Not Classified By Court

HAMMER & STEEL, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATI ON

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KAVCIOGLU, ARMENAK

CILLUFFO, DAWNA J

LEONIDOU, JANETTE G.

ROSSI, DEAN C

SOSA, CARLOS E.

HERSEY, CHRISTOPHER J

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SALEK, KEITH

Other Attorneys

SPRINGEL, ADAM H

HAMANT, CANDICE N

LIPSCHULTZ, JAMES D

 

Court Documents

Document.

PROOF OF SERVICE (121) Comment FILED: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #12 FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER (10) Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Document.

FILING (41) Comment FILED: CMC STATEMENT OF AHERN RENTALS INC., FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (21) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF ROGER F. LIU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DESIGNATE CASE AS COMPLEX

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (16) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/13 FILED.

Request.

REQUEST (7) Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF S.J. AMOROSO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING COMPLIANCE.

Amended.

AMENDED FILING Comment AMEN: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER FILED BY DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY.

Notice.

NOTICE (2) Comment N: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION ON STOP NOTICE FILED BY CEM BUILDERS INC, DAVID BRANDON ROSSI, LESLEY RICE MATHESON.

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY CEM BUILDERS INC, DAVID BRANDON ROSSI, LESLEY RICE MATHESON.

Request.

REQUEST (25) Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEF PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD BY PLTF HARRIS BLADE.

Document.

FILING (89) Comment FILED: STIP & ORDER MODIFYING FILING & BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF MSJ OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (35) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #9 SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 10/27/14 FILED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (23) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/13 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (22) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF CANDICE N. HAMANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Document.

FILING (13) Comment FILED: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

Motion.

NOTICE (13) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION FOR ALL PURPOSES FILED BY S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.INC.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (8) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF KEITH SALEK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY HAMMER & STEEL INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATI

Request.

REQUEST (4) Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES.

343 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERS BOARD; Comment: 0008 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HARRIS BLADE RENTAL; Comment: 0008 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: VIGILANT INSURANCE; Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CALIFORNIA CAISSONS & SHORING INC; Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: VIGILANT INSURANCE; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO INC; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HAMMER & STEEL INC; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERS BOARD; Comment: 0006 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Comment: 0005 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HARRIS BLADE RENTAL; Comment: 0005 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERS BOARD; Comment: 0004 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Comment: 0004 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO INC; Comment: 0004 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CEM BUILDERS INC; Comment: 0004 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AHERN RENTALS INC; Comment: 0004 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: FEDERAL INSURANCE COPMANY; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PENINSULA CORRIDORJOINT POWERBOARD; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: GONSALVES & STRONCK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: MATHESON LESLEY RICE; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ROSSI, DAVID BRANDON; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CEM BUILDERS, INC; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
1,330 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2013
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201212280383 S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201212280381 S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201208310852 S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201201190742 S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Financial info for S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • Financial: S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO.,INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $2,520.00; Total Payments and Credits $2,520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hammer & Steel, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tucker Engineering is a litigant

Latest cases where CEM Builders, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Gonsalves And Stronck Construction Company, Inc. is a litigant