This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 00:07:08 (UTC).

SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC. vs. Z&L PROPERTIES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Z L PROPERTIES, INC ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2058

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendants

Z&L PROPERTIES, INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLITTLE, WALLACE C.

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEWS, LEODIS C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIIVL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIIVL CASE COVER SHEET

Amended Summons Issued / Filed.

Amended Summons Issued / Filed

Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Amended Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; AMENDED SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NTC Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; AMENDED SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NTC OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT served to LAURA BAKER AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Z&L PROPERTIES, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-034596-HOJ Z&L PROPERTIES, INC. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Z&L PROPERTIES, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Z&L PROPERTIES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIIVL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIIVL CASE COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-019569-HOJ SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; SINGER ASSOCIATES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less