This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 16:47:37 (UTC).

Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation vs. Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Signature Glass Windows, Inc , a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Roberts Construction, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2790

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation

Defendants

AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS. LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, A NATINAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF BNC AMERICA MERRILL LYNCH COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE INC., MULTIFAMILY MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2011-KAIV

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SECKER, ANNE

Defendant Attorneys

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

KORBEL, GREGORY J

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023671-HOJ Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Michael Roberts Construction, Inc., a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS. LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023616-HOJ AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS. LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS. LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS. LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-019390-HOJ Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Signature Glass & Windows, Inc., a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Co is a litigant