This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 04:53:27 (UTC).

SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC. vs. ART WANG, et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 SIERRA LUMBER FENCE CO , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ART WANG,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Mau, Michael L and WEINER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2629

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Mau, Michael L

WEINER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.

Defendants

WANG, ART

WANG, KAREN

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON, JOSEPH P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE

Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time.

Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time Order Extending Time To ServeOrder Continuing Case Manag Comment Order Extending Time To Serve Order Continuing Case Management Conference SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER 9/15/2022

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS Comment FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

Ex Parte Declaration.

Ex Parte Declaration OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR ORDER EXTENDIN Comment OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND FOR ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS DECLARATION I Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT ETC.

Order for Publication of Summons.

Order for Publication of Summons Publication in: SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMESSigned by: JUDGE WEINEROn: Comment Publication in: SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES Signed by: JUDGE WEINER On: 9/15/2022

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; WANG, ART; WANG, KAREN; DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE; Comment: PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL 1/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-033783-HOJ SWIFT ATTORNEY SERVICE $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Publication of Summons.; Additional Info: Order for Publication of Summons Publication in: SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMESSigned by: JUDGE WEINEROn: Comment Publication in: SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES Signed by: JUDGE WEINER On: 9/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS DECLARATION I Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Declaration.; Additional Info: Ex Parte Declaration OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR ORDER EXTENDIN Comment OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND FOR ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-024684-HOJ Sierra Lumber & Fence Co., Inc $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; SIERRA LUMBER & FENCE CO., INC.; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less