This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 05:01:48 (UTC).

SHISHIR PURI vs. ANDY'S BP, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2016 SHISHIR PURI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANDY'S BP, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E., DuBois, Richard H., Dylina, Steven L., Scott, Joseph C., Greenberg, Susan and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0718

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E.

DuBois, Richard H.

Dylina, Steven L.

Scott, Joseph C.

Greenberg, Susan

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PURI, SHISHIR

Defendants

PRASAD, KESHAW

ANDY'S BP, INC.

SABERI, THOMAS I.

SABERI, ANDY

KUMAR, RAVINDER

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

SELF-SERVE PETROLEUM, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SGANGA, MICHAEL W

Canny, Paula K.

Defendant Attorney

LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A M

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Demurrer.

*CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 01/26/2018 Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Hearing on Demurrer.

*CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 11/02/2017 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Motion to Strike.

*CIV Minute Order - Motion to Strike 10/19/2017 Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment PLAINTIFF SHISHIR PURI'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION BY DEFENDANTS.... served on MICHAEL W. SGANGA Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION BY DEFENDANTS.... served on MICHAEL W. SGANGA

Notice.

Notice AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS.... Comment AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS....

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re DEFENDANTS RAVINDER KUMAR AND KESHAW PRASAD DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMEND Comment DEFENDANTS RAVINDER KUMAR AND KESHAW PRASAD DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demurrer to Amended Complaint.

Demurrer to Amended Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF XAVIER AM LAVOIPIERRA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION ETC Comment DECLARATION OF XAVIER AM LAVOIPIERRA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, ETC

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/16/2018 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present DefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A MDefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A MDefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A MDefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A MDefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A MDefendantAttorney: LAVOIPIERRE, XAVIER A M

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Answer.

Answer ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS RAVINDER KUMAR AN Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS RAVINDER KUMAR AND KESHAW PRASAD TO PLAINTIFF SHISHIR PURI'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demurrer to.

Demurrer to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES Comment SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Hearing on Demurrer.

*CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 10/19/2017 Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLA Comment OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: PURI SHISHIR; ANDY'S BP, INC.; SABERI, ANDY; SABERI, THOMAS I.; KUMAR, RAVINDER; PRASAD, KESHAW; SELF-SERVE PETROLEUM, INC.; DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: PRASAD KESHAW; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL AS TO KESHAW PRASAD ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: KUMAR RAVINDER; Comment; Comment; (DISMISSAL AS TO RAVINDER KUMAR ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal 07/16/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Original Type Jury Trial ~CIV Minute Order - Jury Trial 05/28/2019 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Not Held Comment Jury Trial time estimate; 7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs. Additional Info: Memorandum of Costs 1230.00 Comment 1,230.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial info for ANDY'S BP, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-086728-HOJ ONE LEGAL $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial info for ANDY'S BP, INC. : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Financial info for ANDY'S BP, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-064678-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Financial info for ANDY'S BP, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Financial: ANDY'S BP, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $735.00; Total Payments and Credits $735.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial info for PURI, SHISHIR : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-054238-HOJ PURI, SHISHIR $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial info for PURI, SHISHIR : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Financial info for PURI, SHISHIR : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-032789-HOJ PURI, SHISHIR $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Financial info for PURI, SHISHIR : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Financial: PURI, SHISHIR; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less