Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 22:58:03 (UTC).

Sheri Jepsen vs. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Sheri Jepsen filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y. and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3967

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y.

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jepsen, Sheri

Defendants

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON, ROBERT S

Defendant Attorney

RIECHERT, MELINDA S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court FEDERAL/ DISTRICT COURT CASE # 3:20-CV-07428 Comment FEDERAL/ DISTRICT COURT CASE # 3:20-CV-07428

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint (FILING VERSION).pdf

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons (FILING VERSION).pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Case cover sheet (FILING VERSION).pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court. Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court FEDERAL/ DISTRICT COURT CASE # 3:20-CV-07428 Comment FEDERAL/ DISTRICT COURT CASE # 3:20-CV-07428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-040962-HOJ AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jepsen, Sheri : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036291-HOJ Jepsen, Sheri $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jepsen, Sheri : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Jepsen, Sheri; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, ROBERT S